Curnew, Gregory Paul (CPSO#: 58797)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Nov 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2A
232 Cannon Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A9
Phone: (905) 667-0783
Fax: (905) 667-0785
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L3L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 667-0783
Fax: (905) 667-0785
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Curnew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Curnew ( CPSO# 58797 )

Business Address:
2A - 232 Cannon Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 667-0783

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY PAUL CURNEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURNEW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1988