Curran, Daniel Edward Hugh (CPSO#: 82684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lennox & Addington County General
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Weeneebayko General Hospital
19 Hospital Drive, Box 664
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Canada
Phone: 705-658-4544
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel E.H. Curran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Curran ( CPSO# 82684 )

Business Address:
Lennox and Addington County General
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
Weeneebayko General Hospital
Box 664
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Creek ON  P0L 1W0

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL EDWARD HUGH CURRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007