Curtis, Michael Allison (CPSO#: 82657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519)272-8200
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

InMedic Pain Management Centre
685 Adelaide Street North
London Ontario
London ON  N5Y 2L4
Canada
Phone: (519) 601-7171
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

InMedic Pain Management Centre
525 Belmont Avenue West
Unit 110
Kitchener Ontario
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Canada
Phone: (519) 621-9257
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Lighthouse Medical Centre
2 Main Street South, Unit 3
PO Box 89
Bayfield Ontario
Bayfield ON  N0M1G0
Canada
Phone: (519)565-4141
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Curtis Schmitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Curtis ( CPSO# 82657 )
Dr. C. Schmitz ( CPSO# 84508 )

Business Address:
24 Centennial Drive
Seaforth ON  N0K 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 527-1650

Business Address:
685 Adelaide Street North
London ON  N5Y 2L4
Phone Number: (519) 601-7171

Business Address:
525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone Number: (519) 621-9257

Business Address:
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Business Address:
Unit 3
2 Main Street South
Bayfield ON  N0M 1G0
Phone Number: (519) 565-4141

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Feb 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALLISON CURTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURTIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2009