Curtis, Michael William (CPSO#: 59496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6410
Fax: (519) 749-6411
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Curtis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Curtis ( CPSO# 59496 )

Business Address:
St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6410

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (579) 749-4242

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Sep 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL WILLIAM CURTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURTIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1989