Cusack, Meghan Marie (CPSO#: 88437)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sudbury Family Healthcare Clinic
Suite 102
430 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K7
Phone: (705) 222-7342
Fax: (705) 222-7341
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Meghan Cusack Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cusack ( CPSO# 88437 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Family Healthcare Clinic
Suite 102
430 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 222-7342

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGHAN MARIE CUSACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUSACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010