Cutbush, Wesley Shier (CPSO#: 28365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queenston Walk-In Clinic
Suite 103
632 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K 6R5
Phone: (905) 578-9255
Fax: (905) 578-9082
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Barrie Medical Clinics
Administration Office
829 Big Bay Point Road
Barrie ON  L4N 4E1
Canada
Phone: (705) 726-1544
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wesley Shier Cutbush Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 2 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WESLEY SHIER CUTBUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUTBUSH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2007