Cutrara, Charles Augustine (CPSO#: 60677)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Cardiovascular Associates
89 Queensway West
Suite 608
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-2550
Fax: (905) 848-5037
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles Cutrara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cutrara ( CPSO# 60677 )

Business Address:
Trillium Cardiovascular Associates
608 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-7513

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiothoracic Surgery Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES AUGUSTINE CUTRARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUTRARA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 7 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 8 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1991