Czarnecki, Andrew (CPSO#: 88108)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room D375
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-5880
Fax: 416-480-5827
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Czarnecki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Czarnecki ( CPSO# 88108 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room D375
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4668

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW CZARNECKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZARNECKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 06 Mar 2008 to 02 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2008 to 26 Aug 2008
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010