D'Agostino, Michael Steven (CPSO#: 82909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 3674
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael D'Agostino Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. D'Agostino ( CPSO# 82909 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Pathology Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL STEVEN D'AGOSTINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'AGOSTINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2011