D'Alessandro, Enzo (CPSO#: 61692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Pavia, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
1615 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 4H4
Phone: (416) 651-7100
Fax: (416) 652-3007
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Enzo D'Alessandro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. E. D'Alessandro ( CPSO# 61692 )

Business Address:
302 - 1615 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 4H4
Phone Number: (416) 651-7100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Italy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ENZO D'ALESSANDRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'ALESSANDRO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 15 Sep 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1994