Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

D'Sa, Alfred Joseph (CPSO#: 60762)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alfred D'Sa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. D'Sa ( CPSO# 60762 )

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Business Address:
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (877) 292-4284

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALFRED JOSEPH D'SA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1990