D'Souza, Mirabelle Clare (CPSO#: 84244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 112
2737 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3M 2E9
Phone: (647) 346-3055
Fax: (647) 346-3099
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. C. D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. D'Souza ( CPSO# 84244 )

Business Address:
112 - 2737 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3M 2E9
Phone Number: (647) 346-3055

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRABELLE CLARE D'SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SOUZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011