Da Silva, Agnelo Jose (CPSO#: 21780)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B.E. Wright Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2015

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients who saw Dr. Da Silva outside of a hospital, can request a copy of their records by sending an e-mail to: drjosephdasilva@gmail.com
Date Received: 31 Jan 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015