Dagnone, Jeffrey Damon (CPSO#: 77629)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
76 Stuart Street Empire 3
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2368
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Damon Dagnone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dagnone ( CPSO# 77629 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Empire 3
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2368

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY DAMON DAGNONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAGNONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2007