Dajczak, Stanislaw Peter (CPSO#: 63857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1721 Medical Blvd,Suite D
FINDLAY OH  45840
United States
Phone: (419) 429-6473
Fax: (419) 424-0926
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10657 Lakeview Dr.
RR#3
Chatham ON  N7M 5J3
Canada
Phone: (419) 439-1977
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan
USA - North Carolina
USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STANISLAW PETER DAJCZAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAJCZAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992