Daley, Scott Edward (CPSO#: 81922)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Scott Daley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Daley ( CPSO# 81922 )

Business Address:
Ferris Medical Clinic
1500 Fisher Street
North Bay ON  P1B 2H3
Phone Number: (705) 495-4000

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Business Address:
West Nipissing General Hospital
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone Number: (705) 753-3110

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT EDWARD DALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Sep 2004 to 27 Oct 2004
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005