Dalziel, Peter Scott (CPSO#: 30061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Med Team Walk-in Clinic
99 Kakulu Road, Ste 103
Kanata
ON K2L3C8
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Phone: (613) 592-1448
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Westboro Family Care Centre
190 Richmond Road
Ottawa
K1Z6W6
Ottawa ON  K1Z 6W6
Canada
Phone: (613) 719-7837
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Dr. M. Tamboli
4 Richmond Road
Ottawa
K2A4H1
Ottawa ON  K2A4H1
Canada
Phone: (613) 729-1773
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter S. Dalziel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dalziel ( CPSO# 30061 )

Business Address:
103 - 99 Kakulu Road
Ottawa ON  K2L 3C8
Phone Number: (613) 592-1448

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER SCOTT DALZIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALZIEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Sep 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1983