Damus, Alexander Michael (CPSO#: 63711)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite B
2 Elgin Park Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 0B1
Phone: (905) 852-1009
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Michael Damus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Damus ( CPSO# 63711 )

Business Address:
Suite B
2 Elgin Park Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9L 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 852-1009

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER MICHAEL DAMUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAMUS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1992