Daniel, Geoffrey Blake (CPSO#: 58212)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waypoint
Bayfield Building
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone: (877) 341-4729
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geoff Daniel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Daniel ( CPSO# 58212 )

Business Address:
Waypoint
Bayfield Building
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone Number: (705) 549-3181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEOFFREY BLAKE DANIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1988