Darrat, Mahmoud Abdelmuneim (CPSO#: 72895)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Mar 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44890
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

32-1960 apple by line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Canada
Phone: (905) 335-1888
Fax: (905) 335-5656
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

726 upper James st
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (905) 575-5643
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Darrat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Darrat ( CPSO# 72895 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jul 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHMOUD ABDELMUNEIM DARRAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DARRAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 08 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 09 Jul 1999 to 08 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 09 Jul 2000 to 08 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 09 Jul 2001 to 08 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 09 Jul 2002 to 08 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2004