Dastmalchian, Seyed Kazem (CPSO#: 111175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jan 2017


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian


Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 118
7163 Yonge St.
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C6
Phone: (905) 597 6543
Fax: (905) 597 8765
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1385 Harmony Rd, North
Located inside Loblaw's Superstore
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K5
Phone: 9054369646
Fax: 9054369666
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dastmalchian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2017

Dr. S. Dastmalchian ( CPSO# 111175)

Business Address:
1385 Harmony Road North
Located inside Loblaw's Superstore
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K5
Phone Number: (905) 436-9646

Business Address:
Suite 118
7163 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C6
Phone Number: (905) 597-6543


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. SEYED KAZEM DASTMALCHIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DASTMALCHIAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Nov 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2017