Datta, Sudip (CPSO#: 76753)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Charlton Avenue
Thornhill ON  L4J 6W4
Phone: (416) 628-8318
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cardiac Care Centre
Suite 104
200 Ronson Drive
Toronto ON  M9W 5Z9
Canada
Phone: (416) 740-2500
Fax: (416) 740-2502
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sudip Datta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Datta ( CPSO# 76753 )

Business Address:
11 Charlton Avenue
Thornhill ON  L4J 6W4
Phone Number: (416) 648-2838

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUDIP DATTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DATTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Nov 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2012