Davallou, Mojgan (CPSO#: 81407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, German

Education:Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58439
Fax: (905) 494-6569
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke General Hospital
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58439
Fax: (905) 494-6569
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave
Mississauga
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Scarborough Rouge Health System
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Davallou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Davallou ( CPSO# 81407 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOJGAN DAVALLOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVALLOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2008