Davenport, Eric (CPSO#: 79054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Davenport MPC
504 Edward Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 4P9
Phone: (807) 285-4860
Fax: (807) 285-4857
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Davenport Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Davenport ( CPSO# 79054 )

Business Address:
504 North Edward Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 4P9
Phone Number: (807) 285-4860

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC DAVENPORT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVENPORT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008