Davidson, Anna (CPSO#: 33301)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Fedkowicz, Anna (used until: 15 Jun 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anna Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017