Davidson, Marilyn Jean (CPSO#: 52517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite M1-102
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6705
Fax: (416) 480-5761
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Michaels Hopsital
30 Bond St, Rm 8-163
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416-864-5052
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 08 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARILYN JEAN DAVIDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIDSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1986