Davidson, Simon Issac (CPSO#: 32287)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 22 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ontario Health Records 401 Smyth Rd Ottawa, ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 18 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017