Davidson, William (CPSO#: 19405)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Feb 1965

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 1965

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 111
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone: (905) 897-0788
Fax: (905) 897-9229
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Davidson ( CPSO# 19405 )

Business Address:
Suite 111
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 897-0788

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 17 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM DAVIDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIDSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1965