Davies, Andrew Mark (CPSO#: 59704)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
123 Millennium Parkway
R R 5
Belleville ON  K8N 4Z5
Phone: (613) 961-7440
Fax: (613) 961-1798
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.M. Davies Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Davies ( CPSO# 59704 )

Business Address:
123 Millennium Parkway
Belleville ON  K8N 4Z5
Phone Number: (613) 961-7440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW MARK DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1989