Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Davies, Edward Thomas (CPSO#: 58235)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital
B8-007
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3458
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ward Davies Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Davies ( CPSO# 58235 )

Business Address:
University Hospital
B8-007
339 Windermere Road
Londesborough ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3458

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD THOMAS DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1990