Davila Acosta, Jorge Humberto (CPSO#: 87967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jan 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Peruana Cayetano Heredia University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Radiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3582
Fax: (613) 738-4811
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Davila Acosta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Davila Acosta ( CPSO# 87967 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Radiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Paediatric Radiology Effective: 02 Mar 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Neuroradiology Effective: 02 Mar 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 07 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Mar 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Mar 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Jorge  Humberto  Davila  Acosta  may  practise  medicine  independently in
            paediatric radiology and neuroradiology.