Davis, Ian Robert Charles (CPSO#: 65304)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen Elizabeth II HSC
5820 University Ave
5th Floor ACC
Halifax NS  B3H 1V7
Phone: (902) 473-8477
Fax: (902) 473-7394
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I.R.C. Davis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN ROBERT CHARLES DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2000 to 02 Feb 2000
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993