Davoudpour, Parham (CPSO#: 83127)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Dept. Emergency Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
(416) 438 2911
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Davoudpour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Davoudpour ( CPSO# 83127 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Apr 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARHAM DAVOUDPOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVOUDPOUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2009