Dawood, Samar (CPSO#: 101963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Central America Health Sc. University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leamington Area Family Health Team
Unit 10
59 Main Street East
Kingsville ON  N9Y 1A1
Phone: (519) 322-1100
Fax: (519) 322-2055
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Leamington District Memorial Hosp
Department of Emergency Medicine
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 322-2501
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samar Dawood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dawood ( CPSO# 101963)

Business Address:
Leamington Area Family Health Team
Unit 10
59 Main Street East
Kingsville ON  N9Y 1A1
Phone Number: (519) 322-1100

Business Address:
Leamington District Memorial Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-2501

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMAR DAWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWOOD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 11 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2015