Dawson, David Fredrick Laing (CPSO#: 24714)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

231 Bay Street North
Hamilton ON  L8R 2R1
Canada
Phone: (905) 540-8532
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

55 Wyndham Street N
#212
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Canada
Phone: 519 837-4444
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David F. L. Dawson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dawson ( CPSO# 24714 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2300

Business Address:
212 - 55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone Number: (519) 837-4444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID FREDRICK LAING DAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1972