Day, John Charles (CPSO#: 73677)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 128
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 946-0251
Fax: (519) 946-0253
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Day & Tsui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Day ( CPSO# 73677 )
Dr. A. Tsui ( CPSO# 73559 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
128 - 2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N9V 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 946-0251

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN CHARLES DAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001