De Beer, Justin De Villiers (CPSO#: 61348)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Dec 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 705
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone: (905) 527-1115
Fax: (905) 528-8150
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Justin DeBeer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. De Beer ( CPSO# 61348 )

Business Address:
1 Young Street
Suite 705
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 527-1115

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTIN DE VILLIERS DE BEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE BEER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1990