De Boeck, Thomas John (CPSO#: 71129)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Bay General Hospital
Midland ON  L4R 1N6
Phone: (705) 526-3751
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Canada
Phone: (705) 434-5100
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS JOHN DE BOECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE BOECK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002