De France, Bryon Felix (CPSO#: 67779)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 4D 14
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76254
Fax: (905) 527-2675
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bryon De France Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. De France ( CPSO# 67779 )

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Room 4D 14
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYON FELIX DE FRANCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE FRANCE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999