De La Roche, Michael Richmond Pierre (CPSO#: 60723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville General Hospital
P O Box 428
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E2
Phone: 613-969-5511 Ext. 2361
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael de la Roche Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. De La Roche ( CPSO# 60723 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL RICHMOND PIERRE DE LA ROCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE LA ROCHE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990