De Meulemeester, Christine Anne (CPSO#: 65145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital-Civic Site
Room C2196
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 16234
Fax: (613) 761-5360
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine De Meulemeester Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. De Meulemeester ( CPSO# 65145 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital-Civic Site
Room C2196
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 11 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ANNE DE MEULEMEESTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE MEULEMEESTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993