De Odorico, Iris (CPSO#: 63771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 111
279 Wharncliffe Road
London ON  N6H 2C2
Phone: (519) 661-0275
Fax: (519) 661-0616
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: De Odorico Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. De Odorico ( CPSO# 63771 )

Business Address:
111 - 297 Wharncliffe Road North
London ON  N6H 2C2
Phone Number: (519) 661-0275

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Mar 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRIS DE ODORICO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE ODORICO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1992