De Sa, Vincent Xavier (CPSO#: 28882)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Swahili

Education:University College of East Africa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vincent Desa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 23 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 194 Court Street North, Thunder Bay, ON, P7A 4V7
Date Received: 03 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016