De, Sabe Kumar (CPSO#: 87970)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
Room B6-129A
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3428
Fax: (519) 663-3764
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sabe De Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. De ( CPSO# 87970 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
Room B6 - 129A
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3428

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SABE KUMAR DE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2011