DeSa, Michelle Gwen (CPSO#: 76226)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Nov 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pickering Medical Centre
Suite 210
1885 Glenanna Road
Pickering ON  L1V 6R6
Phone: (905) 420-5776
Fax: (905) 420-8523
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle DeSa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. DeSa ( CPSO# 76226 )

Business Address:
Pickering Medical Centre
Suite 210
1885 Glenanna Road
Pickering ON  L1V 6R6

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE GWEN DESA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Jan 2005 to 04 Feb 2005
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2005