Deans, Robin Michael (CPSO#: 57389)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4
1270 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8Y 4T4
Phone: (519) 256-9333
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robin Deans Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Deans ( CPSO# 57389 )

Business Address:
1270 Walker Road
Unit 4
Windsor ON  N8Y 4T4
Phone Number: (519) 256-9333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 13 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBIN MICHAEL DEANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEANS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989