Degani, Aqeel Cassim (CPSO#: 88391)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rideau Valley Health Centre
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 5V7
Phone: (613) 258-8710
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Degani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Degani ( CPSO# 88391 )

Business Address:
Rideau Valley Health Centre
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 5V7
Phone Number: (613) 258-8710

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AQEEL CASSIM DEGANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEGANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010