Degani, Naeema (CPSO#: 33641)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C Degani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Degani ( CPSO# 28501 )
Dr. N. Degani ( CPSO# 33641 )

Business Address:
7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill ON  L3T 4A3
Phone Number: (905) 889-1125

Medical Records Location

Address: 451 Bob-O-Link Road Mississauga ON L5J 2P3
Date Received: 26 May 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Feb 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 May 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017