Deichert, Kenneth Wayne (CPSO#: 60910)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Hills Family Health
Upper Level
171 Guelph Street
Georgetown ON  L7G 4A1
Phone: (905) 877-4123
Fax: (905) 873-8882
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth Deichert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Deichert ( CPSO# 60910 )

Business Address:
Halton Hills Family Health
Upper Level
171 Guelph Street
Georgetown ON  L7G 4A1
Phone Number: (905) 877-4123

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador
Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH WAYNE DEICHERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEICHERT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1990