Deif, Hassan (CPSO#: 32110)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Dec 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1980

Summary

Former Name: Deif, Hassan Mahmoud Ismail (used until: 07 Nov 2012 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Alexandria, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hosp, Radioliogy
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6181
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

York Radiology Consultants
1333 Sheppard Ave. E,
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6181
Fax: (416) 756-6095
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deif Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Deif ( CPSO# 32110 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital - Branson Site
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5

Business Address:
Oak Ridges Medical Diagnostic Imaging
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6

Business Address:
Lawrence-Kingston Road X-Ray & Ultrasound
4125 Lawrence Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1E 2S2

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1

Business Address:
30 Medalist Road
Toronto ON  M2P 1Y5

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 10 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HASSAN DEIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEIF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1980